Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {183229/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Pre-filed |