House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 754 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (116-18) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (34-11) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {653624/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-1) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Pre-filed |