Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (102-37) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {293828/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Pre-filed |