House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (108-21) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {973422/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading Passed (114-22) | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {473324/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Pre-filed |