House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133 | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-10) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (109-29) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {953923/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/14/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |