House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (40-7) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (100-37) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |