LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Maryland MD
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB278
Action History
MD
Maryland House Bill HB278
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Maryland 2024 Regular Session
Maryland House Bill HB278
Action History
Senate
02/26/2024
Referred Judicial Proceedings
House
02/22/2024
Third Reading Passed (110-27)
House
02/20/2024
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
House
02/19/2024
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House
01/18/2024
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House
01/12/2024
First Reading Environment and Transportation