House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 820 | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {663028/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |