House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 994 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {593927/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {413829/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/15/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |