House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/15/2024 | First Reading Judiciary |