House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {473526/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |