House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 977 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {993425/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {873521/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |