Senate | 02/26/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Third Reading Passed (101-34) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Floor Amendment {803021/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (35-99) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Adams) Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {813629/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |