House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (132-5) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |