Senate | 02/26/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Third Reading Passed (119-16) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |