House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 907 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |