House | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (122-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |