House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {753128/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |