House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (40-7) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (133-1) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {483123/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |