Senate | 03/11/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (96-37) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Floor Committee Amendment {953427/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Hartman) Adopted | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |