Senate | 04/05/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (118-11) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {583222/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |