House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 905 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {523624/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |