House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (103-27) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (36-11) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {613921/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (100-38) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Floor Amendment {403223/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (36-102) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {923724/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |