House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (130-2) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {433227/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (124-2) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |