Senate | 03/22/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (102-26) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {193526/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |