House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {163324/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Judiciary |