House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (32-7) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (114-19) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {643821/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means |