House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |