House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {713422/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |