House
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (98-35)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {733423/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Gallion) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {733423/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred Finance Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (100-33)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Floor Amendment {103425/1 (Delegate Tomlinson) Rejected (39-101)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Tomlinson) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {693920/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
First Reading Appropriations
|
|
|