House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (114-24) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-2) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {313527/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (121-15) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {893929/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |