Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Third Reading Passed (94-38) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Floor Amendment {853524/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (38-95) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Motion Special Order until 02/28 (Delegate M. Morgan) Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |