Senate | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading Passed (99-39) | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Floor Amendment {513522/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (37-95) | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate M. Morgan) Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {213528/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |