House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1009 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |