Senate | 04/01/2024 | Withdrawn by Sponsor | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {383922/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |