Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Judiciary |