Senate | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |