House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {103125/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {573627/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |