House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 842 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (34-13) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Third Reading Passed (101-34) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Floor Amendment {143122/1 (Delegate Tomlinson) Rejected (36-100) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Floor Amendment {483422/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (33-102) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Pippy) Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {683621/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |