House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 947 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (125-7) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {663623/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (128-5) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/10/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | First Reading Judiciary |