House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {903525/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {803722/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Appropriations | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 10/09/2023 | Pre-filed |