House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231 | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-10) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (98-36) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {123327/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | Pre-filed |