House
|
05/16/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 939
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Conference Committee Report {513621/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Waldstreicher and West)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Refuses Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Phillips, Cardin and Arikan)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {233424/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {503023/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
First Reading Judiciary
|
|
|