Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {833828/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Reassigned to Appropriations | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |