House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Third Reading Passed (128-4) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |