Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Third Reading Passed (108-25) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Motion Special Order until 02/28 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |