House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (130-7) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {633723/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |