House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (127-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {943022/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {633023/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Judiciary |