House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {903729/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |