House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 922 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {653427/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 07/27/2023 | Pre-filed |